NC H98 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Ch. SL 2019-101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Ch. SL 2019-101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Macon/Clay/No Right-of-Way Spotlighting
Title
Macon/Clay/No Right-of-Way Spotlighting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Ch. SL 2019-101 | |
2019-07-10 | Ratified | |
2019-07-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-09 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2019-07-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019 |
2019-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-07-08 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2019 |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-03-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/20/2019 |
2019-03-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-03-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-18 | House | Filed |