NC S1015 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Homeowner and Homebuyer Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowner and Homebuyer Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-07 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-02 Ch. SL 2010-164
2010-08-02 Signed By Gov. 8/2/2010
2010-07-08 Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010
2010-07-08 Ratified
2010-07-07 Concurred In H/com Sub
2010-07-06 Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010
2010-07-06 Rec To Concur H Com Sub
2010-07-06 Rec From House
2010-07-06 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-06 Amend Adopted 4
2010-07-06 Amend Adopted 3
2010-07-01 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-07-01 Amendment Withdrawn 2
2010-07-01 Reconsidered Adoption
2010-07-01 Amend Adopted 2
2010-07-01 Amend Failed 1
2010-06-30 Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010
2010-06-30 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-06-30 Withdrawn From Com
2010-06-29 Re-ref Com On Finance
2010-06-29 Pursuant Rule 38(b)
2010-06-29 Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
2010-06-02 Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
2010-06-02 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-05-18 Ref to the Com on Financial Institutions, if favorable, Judiciary II
2009-05-18 Passed 1st Reading
2009-05-13 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-05-13 Amend Adopted #1
2009-05-12 Com Substitute Adopted
2009-05-12 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-03-26 Ref To Com On Judiciary I
2009-03-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1060 (Same As) 2009-04-06 - Ref to the Com on Financial Institutions, if favorable, Judiciary II

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1015&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1015v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1015v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1015v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1015v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1015v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1015v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1015v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1015v7.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1015v8.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=392
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=393
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1509

Bill Comments

feedback