NC S1096 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Ch. Res 2010-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Ch. Res 2010-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Christopher Duffy Collins
Title
Honor Christopher Duffy Collins
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Ch. Res 2010-8 | |
2010-06-15 | Ratified | |
2010-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-12 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-04-06 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Filed |