NC S1115 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Carteret Schools May Administer Oath
Title
Carteret Schools May Administer Oath
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. SL 2010-74 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-30 | Ref To Com On Local Government II | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-23 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-06-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1728 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government