NC S1118 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidate Payments/Early Care & Ed Provider
Title
Consolidate Payments/Early Care & Ed Provider
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-13 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1784 (Same As) 2010-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations