NC S1119 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Early Education Certification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Education Certification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-07 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-02 Ch. SL 2010-178
2010-08-02 Signed By Gov. 8/2/2010
2010-07-08 Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010
2010-07-08 Ratified
2010-07-07 Concurred In H/com Sub
2010-07-06 Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010
2010-07-06 Rec To Concur H Com Sub
2010-07-06 Rec From House
2010-07-06 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-06 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-07-01 Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010
2010-07-01 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-07-01 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-06-22 Ref To Com On Education
2010-06-22 Passed 1st Reading
2010-06-17 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2010-06-16 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-06-16 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-05-13 Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
2010-05-12 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1783 (Same As) 2010-05-19 - Ref To Com On Education

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1119&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1119v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1119v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1119v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1119v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1119v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1119v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1327
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1510

Bill Comments

feedback