NC S1130 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources
Pending: House Wildlife Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources
Pending: House Wildlife Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ashe Fox Trapping/Greene Hunting
Title
Ashe Fox Trapping/Greene Hunting
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Goss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-10 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Wildlife Resources | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1662 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources