NC S1141 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Task Force on Sports Injuries in Schools
Title
Task Force on Sports Injuries in Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Katie Dorsett [D] | Sen. Tony Foriest [D] |
Sen. Fletcher Hartsell [R] | Sen. Richard Stevens [R] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-08 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-17 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1837 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Education, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House