NC S1153 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-03 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-03 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative Task Force on Childhood Obesity
Title
Legislative Task Force on Childhood Obesity
Sponsors
Sen. Austin Allran [R] | Sen. Charlie Dannelly [D] | Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Jean Preston [R] |
Sen. William Purcell [D] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] | Sen. Michael Walters [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-01 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/1/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1827 (Same As) 2010-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House