NC S1154 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

UNC Nonappropriated Capital Projects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNC Nonappropriated Capital Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-02 Ch. SL 2010-172
2010-08-02 Signed By Gov. 8/2/2010
2010-07-08 Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010
2010-07-08 Ratified
2010-07-07 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-06 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-07-01 Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010
2010-07-01 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-07-01 Withdrawn From Com
2010-06-24 Re-ref Com On Appropriations
2010-06-24 Reptd Fav
2010-06-16 Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Appropriations
2010-06-16 Passed 1st Reading
2010-06-14 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-06-10 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-06-09 Reptd Fav
2010-05-17 Ref To Com On Finance
2010-05-13 Filed

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback