NC S1164 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extend GSC Studies
Title
Extend GSC Studies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-10 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-18 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1780 (Same As) 2010-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House