NC S1165 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
General Statutes Comm. Technical Corrections
Title
General Statutes Comm. Technical Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-10 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-96 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Ratified | |
2010-07-10 | Concurred In H Amend # 1 | |
2010-07-10 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-10 | Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Rec To Concur In H Amend | |
2010-07-10 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-10 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-07-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-18 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1740 (Same As) 2010-07-08 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II