NC S117 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Forfeit. Retmt/Anti-Spiking/Serv. Purch/TC
Title
Forfeit. Retmt/Anti-Spiking/Serv. Purch/TC
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Pate [R] | Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] | Sen. Danny Britt [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] |
Sen. Kathryn Harrington [R] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - House - A1 Zachary Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 71 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2018-12-05 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2018-12-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/04/2018 |
2018-12-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-12-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2018-11-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2018-11-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - K-12 |
2017-06-20 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017 |
2017-06-19 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2017-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement |
2017-05-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-17 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-13 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations on Pensions, Compensation, and Benefits |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations on Pensions, Compensation, and Benefits. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H160 (Same As) 2017-04-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate