NC S1176 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Construction of Wills and Trusts
Title
Construction of Wills and Trusts
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Blue [D] | Sen. Peter Brunstetter [R] | Sen. Daniel Clodfelter [D] | Sen. Fletcher Hartsell [R] |
Sen. David Hoyle [D] | Sen. Clark Jenkins [D] | Sen. Joshua Stein [D] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-07 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-126 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-29 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-15 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-15 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-18 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1865 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance