NC S118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Ch. SL 2019-223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prison Safety/TANF State Plan/Clarifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prison Safety/TANF State Plan/Clarifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18 Ch. SL 2019-223
2019-09-18 Signed by Gov. 9/18/2019
2019-09-16 Pres. To Gov. 9/16/2019
2019-09-13 Ratified
2019-09-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-09-12SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-09-11SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-09-11HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-09-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-09-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-09-10HousePlaced On Cal For 09/11/2019
2019-09-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-09-10HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-09-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-09-05HouseRe-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-09-05HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-15HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-08HouseRe-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-08HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-06SenateEngrossed
2019-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-18SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-04-18SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-04SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H108 (Same As) 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-171

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S118
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S118v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S118v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S118v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S118v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S118v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S118v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S118v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/167
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/166
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/809
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/590

Bill Comments

feedback