NC S1193 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Implement LTC Partnership Program
Title
Implement LTC Partnership Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. SL 2010-68 | |
2010-07-08 | Signed By Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Ratified | |
2010-06-29 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-06-24 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-21 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Insurance | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-09 | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Insurance | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-18 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1704 (Same As) 2010-05-13 - Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Insurance