NC S12 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ban Mobile Phone Use While Driving
Title
Ban Mobile Phone Use While Driving
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Dannelly [D] | Sen. Katie Dorsett [D] | Sen. James Forrester [R] | Sen. Linda Garrou [D] |
Sen. Steve Goss [D] | Sen. Edward Jones [D] | Sen. Vernon Malone [D] | Sen. William Purcell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2010-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-11 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-05-11 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-01-29 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-01-28 | Filed |