NC S12 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Ch. SL 2019-5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Fill Certain Vacancies/Alexander & Burke Co

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fill Certain Vacancies/Alexander & Burke Co

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Ch. SL 2019-5
2019-03-19 Ratified
2019-03-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-03-18SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-03-14SenatePlaced On Cal For 03/18/2019
2019-03-14SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-03-14HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-11HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-20HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-02-19SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed
2019-02-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-18SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-02-14SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-12SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-06SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-06SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H55 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback