NC S1212 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local Gov't. Other Post-Employment Benefits
Title
Local Gov't. Other Post-Employment Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | Ch. SL 2010-175 | |
2010-08-02 | Signed By Gov. 8/2/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Ratified | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-07 | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-19 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |