NC S1214 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highway Patrol Motor Carrier Fines/Local Fees
Title
Highway Patrol Motor Carrier Fines/Local Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-09 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-129 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-09 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-09 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-30 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Engrossed | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-06-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |