NC S1216 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Extend Emergency Foreclosure Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Emergency Foreclosure Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-07 - Senate - Third Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-02 Ch. SL 2010-168
2010-08-02 Signed By Gov. 8/2/2010
2010-07-08 Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010
2010-07-08 Ratified
2010-07-07 Concurred On 3rd Reading
2010-07-06 Concurred On 2nd Reading
2010-07-01 Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010
2010-07-01 Withdrawn From Cal
2010-06-30 Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010
2010-06-30 Rec To Concur H Com Sub
2010-06-29 Rec From House
2010-06-29 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-06-28 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-06-24 Placed On Cal For 6/28/2010
2010-06-24 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-06-24 Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
2010-06-16 Re-ref Com On Finance
2010-06-16 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-06-15 Ref to the Com on Financial Institutions, if favorable, Finance
2010-06-15 Passed 1st Reading
2010-06-10 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2010-06-09 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-06-09 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-06-08 Re-ref Com On Finance
2010-06-08 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-06-08 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-05-19 Ref To Com On Commerce
2010-05-18 Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1216&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1216v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1216v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1216v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1216v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1216v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1216v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1216v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1216v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1305
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1476
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1506

Bill Comments

feedback