NC S124 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assumed Bus. Name/IC Contempt/Parks
Title
Assumed Bus. Name/IC Contempt/Parks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - For Concurrence Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | Ch. SL 2016-100 | |
2016-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016 |
2016-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-06-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-29 | Engrossed | |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |