NC S1242 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying Changes to Gen. Statutes
Title
Clarifying Changes to Gen. Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-10 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-97 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Ratified | |
2010-07-10 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-10 | Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-09 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-07-09 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-07-09 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-07-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-29 | Postponed To 7/6/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2010 | |
2010-06-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-24 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-24 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-24 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-21 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1874 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I