NC S1248 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Ch. SL 2010-162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Early Identif. & Interv. for At-Risk Students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Identif. & Interv. for At-Risk Students

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - Senate - Motion 10\Re-refer Comm (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-23 Ch. SL 2010-162
2010-07-23 Signed By Gov. 7/23/2010
2010-07-09 Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Ratified
2010-07-09 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2010-07-09 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-07-09 Reptd Fav
2010-07-07 Ref To Com On Education
2010-07-07 Passed 1st Reading
2010-07-07 Engrossed
2010-07-07 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2010-07-07 Amend Adopted # 2
2010-07-06 Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010
2010-07-06 Withdrawn From Com
2010-06-07 Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2010-06-07 Withdrawn From Cal
2010-06-07 Amend Pending # 1
2010-06-03 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-06-02 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-06-02 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-05-20 Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
2010-05-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1875 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Education

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1248&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1248v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1248v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1248v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1248v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1248v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1248v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1269
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1280
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1494
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1495

Bill Comments

feedback