NC S1251 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Health Plan/Treat Teachers Equitably
Title
State Health Plan/Treat Teachers Equitably
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Daniel Blue [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-09 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - House Amd. 1\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - House Amd. 1\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-136 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-08 | Fail Concur In H Amend # 1 | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur In H Amend | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-29 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-22 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1853 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Appropriations