NC S1256 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Brevard Academy/Retirement Election
Title
Brevard Academy/Retirement Election
Sponsors
Sen. John Snow [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-137 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2010-07-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Cal For 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-24 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1778 (Same As) 2010-07-08 - Failed concur in S/Com Sub