NC S1263 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-14 - Ref To Com On State Government/State Personnel
Pending: House State Government/State Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-14 - Ref To Com On State Government/State Personnel
Pending: House State Government/State Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Brevard Charter Amendment
Title
Brevard Charter Amendment
Sponsors
Sen. John Snow [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1664 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - Ch. SL 2010-18