NC S129 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Mineral is Gold
Title
State Mineral is Gold
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-233 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-25 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-23 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-23 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-05-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-28 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-02-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |