NC S1319 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-31 - Ref to the Com on Mental Health Reform, if favorable, Appropriations
Pending: House Mental Health Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-31 - Ref to the Com on Mental Health Reform, if favorable, Appropriations
Pending: House Mental Health Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Examine and Adjust Rates/Clubhouses
Title
Examine and Adjust Rates/Clubhouses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-31 | Ref to the Com on Mental Health Reform, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-05-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1885 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref to the Com on Mental Health Reform, if favorable, Appropriations