NC S1323 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend SEAA Board Membership
Title
Amend SEAA Board Membership
Sponsors
Sen. Austin Allran [R] | Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Katie Dorsett [D] |
Sen. Tony Foriest [D] | Sen. Edward Goodall [R] | Sen. Richard Stevens [R] | Sen. Donald Vaughan [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-109 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-02 | Pres. To Gov. 7/2/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Ratified | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-29 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-29 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-15 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2010-06-15 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1884 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education