NC S133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Rate-Making Amendments.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rate-Making Amendments.-AB

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-20SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H221 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback