NC S1332 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Spay/Neuter Program Transfer
Title
Spay/Neuter Program Transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-24 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-22 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |