NC S1338 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Fire Safe Cigarettes
Title
Fire Safe Cigarettes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1905 (Same As) 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-101