NC S1345 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources
Pending: House Wildlife Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources
Pending: House Wildlife Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Greensboro/Relocation of Wildlife
Title
Greensboro/Relocation of Wildlife
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-24 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Wildlife Resources | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-24 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1928 (Same As) 2010-05-24 - Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Wildlife Resources