NC S1356 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ch. SL 2010-23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Ch. SL 2010-23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Wilkesboro Firemen's Pension
Title
Increase Wilkesboro Firemen's Pension
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Goss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Ch. SL 2010-23 | |
2010-06-28 | Ratified | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-22 | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-25 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2010-05-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1941 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement