NC S1357 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expand Cabarrus County Tourism Authority
Title
Expand Cabarrus County Tourism Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Ch. SL 2010-79 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-06 | Postponed To 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-07 | Ref To Com On Local Government II | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-25 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H2060 (Same As) 2010-05-27 - Ref To Com On Local Government II