NC S137 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-21 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-21 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Summary
Military Death/In-State Tuition/Dependent.
Title
Military Death/In-State Tuition/Dependent.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Harris Blake [R] | Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. James Forrester [R] |
Sen. Neal Hunt [R] | Sen. Jean Preston [R] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-21 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-07-21 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-09 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-07-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-07 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S137 |