NC S137 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging
Pending: Senate Pensions & Retirement & Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging
Pending: Senate Pensions & Retirement & Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Charlotte Firefighters' Retirement
Title
Charlotte Firefighters' Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H70 (Same As) 2015-06-01 - Ch. SL 2015-42