NC S138 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-538
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-538
Summary
Salvia Divinorum Unlawful.
Title
Salvia Divinorum Unlawful.
Sponsors
Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Katie Dorsett [D] | Sen. William Purcell [D] | Sen. John Snow [D] |
Sen. David Weinstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-538 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-04 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-06-23 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-04 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-06-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary III, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-04-29 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-04-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S138 |