NC S138 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Ch. SL 2019-27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Even-Yr Municipal Elections/Town of Black Mtn

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Even-Yr Municipal Elections/Town of Black Mtn

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17 Ch. SL 2019-27
2019-06-17 Ratified
2019-06-13HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-10HousePlaced On Cal For 06/13/2019
2019-06-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-05HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-05HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-28HouseRef to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-24HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-24SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-23SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-22SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-27SenateRe-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback