NC S1383 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-08 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-08 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Safer Streets/DNA Initiatives
Title
Safer Streets/DNA Initiatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-07-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-26 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-05-25 | Filed |