NC S1386 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Government Employees Port Benefits
Title
Government Employees Port Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-29 | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-21 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-06-15 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-26 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-25 | Filed |