NC S1390 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Ch. Res 2010-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Ch. Res 2010-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring NC Veterans on Memorial Day
Title
Honoring NC Veterans on Memorial Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Ch. Res 2010-3 | |
2010-05-27 | Ratified | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Placed On Cal For 5/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Placed On Cal For 5/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Filed |