NC S1392 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Health Plan/Court-Ordered Guardianships
Title
State Health Plan/Court-Ordered Guardianships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-120 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-07-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-29 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-24 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-26 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2010-05-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1991 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Appropriations