NC S1399 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning/Durham County Protest Petitions
Title
Zoning/Durham County Protest Petitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Ch. SL 2010-80 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-29 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-14 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2010-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-26 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H2033 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity