NC S1400 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-04 - Ch. SL 2010-190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

No Foreclosure/Soldiers on Active Duty

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No Foreclosure/Soldiers on Active Duty

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-09 - Senate - House Amd. 1,2\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-04 Ch. SL 2010-190
2010-08-04 Signed By Gov. 8/4/2010
2010-07-10 Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010
2010-07-10 Ratified
2010-07-09 Concurred In H Amend # 2
2010-07-09 Concurred In H Amend # 1
2010-07-09 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Rec To Concur In H Amend
2010-07-09 Rec From House
2010-07-09 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2010-07-09 Amend Adopted 2
2010-07-09 Amend Adopted 1
2010-07-09 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-07-09 Reptd Fav As Amended
2010-07-09 Ref To Com On Judiciary I
2010-07-09 Passed 1st Reading
2010-07-08 Engrossed
2010-07-08 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2010-07-08 Amend Adopted # 2
2010-07-08 Amend Adopted # 1
2010-07-08 Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010
2010-07-08 Withdrawn From Com
2010-07-07 Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2010-07-07 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-07-07 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-05-26 Ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget
2010-05-25 Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1400&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1400v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1400v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1400v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1400v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1400v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1400v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1556
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1557
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1558
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1593

Bill Comments

feedback