NC S141 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law Enforcement/Various Other Changes
Title
Law Enforcement/Various Other Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - Third Reading\M12 Suspend\Rules (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - A3 Glazier\Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - A2 Stam\Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - A1 Faison\Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - Third Reading\M12 Suspend\Rules (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - A3 Glazier\Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - A2 Stam\Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - A1 Faison\Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-168 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Rules Suspended for 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2012-06-19 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2012-06-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-18 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-18 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-04-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Placed On Cal For 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-04-13 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-04-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-28 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-02-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |