NC S1437 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Ch. SL 2010-58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Ch. SL 2010-58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highlands Mayor Pro Tem
Title
Highlands Mayor Pro Tem
Sponsors
Sen. John Snow [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | Ch. SL 2010-58 | |
2010-07-07 | Ratified | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On Local Government I | |
2010-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-27 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H2045 (Same As) 2010-05-27 - Ref To Com On Local Government I