NC S1445 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Goldsboro-Wayne Municipal Airport/Changes
Title
Goldsboro-Wayne Municipal Airport/Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. SL 2010-76 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Transportation | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-24 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Transportation | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-10 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-27 | Ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H2057 (Same As) 2010-05-27 - Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Transportation