NC S1446 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Durham Stormwater Facilities Assessments
Title
Durham Stormwater Facilities Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Ch. SL 2010-81 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-07-01 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-27 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H2069 (Same As) 2010-05-27 - Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance